Smallwood et al v. Crim et al
Plaintiff: Chandra Loveland, Laura Wickizer and Rachel Haney Smallwood
Defendant: D. Brown, Elizabeth Crim, Steven Shelton, Dr. Steven Shelton and Dr. Catherine E. Crim
Case Number: 3:2018cv01816
Filed: October 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Acosta - regarding IFP Application #5 and Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp 6 - No later than 1/4/19, each plaintiff who wishes to proceed IFP shall file a signed IFP application that complies with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Local Rule 3-4(b ). Failure of any plaintiff to do so or to pay the proper filing fee by that dateshall result in dismissal, without prejudice, of that plaintiff from this lawsuit. IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 5th day of December, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Acosta - DENYING Plaintiff Smallwood's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #5 as it is incomplete, in that no signature is affixed to the signature line, only a typed in name. Plaintiffs' counsel is also to note that an individual IFP Application must be filed for each of the three Plaintiffs. (peg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Leonard)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiffs to submit their individual IFP Applications or pay the $400.00 filing fee by 11/26/18. The clerk shall send 3 IFP forms to plaintiff's counsel. DATED this 25th day of October, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (rs)
October 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (In forma pauperis status selected) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Rachel Haney Smallwood against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Berman, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smallwood et al v. Crim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Steven Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Catherine E. Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Loveland
Represented By: Leonard Randolph Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wickizer
Represented By: Leonard Randolph Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Haney Smallwood
Represented By: Leonard Randolph Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?