Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC v. Nether Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Nether Industries, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: LaBreck Stainless Works, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01838
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on LaBreck Stainless Works, LLC served on 12/7/2018 Filed by Nether Industries, Inc.. (Dod, Barry)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC. (Peterson, Kurt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to LaBreck Stainless Works, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Summons . Filed by Nether Industries, Inc.. (Dod, Barry) Modified on 12/4/2018 to correct docket text to reflect proposed summons (jtj).
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Third Party Complaint against LaBreck Stainless Works, LLC Summons issued as to LaBreck Stainless Steel Works, LLC, an Idaho limited liability corporation. Filed by Nether Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Pages 1-9). (Dod, Barry)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Monday, 2/11/2019 at 10:00AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent by separate sealed entry. (peg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Nether Industries, Inc.. (Dod, Barry)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC. (Peterson, Kurt)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Nether Industries, Inc. served on 11/1/2018 Filed by Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC. (Peterson, Kurt)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Filed by Nether Industries, Inc.. (Dod, Barry)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance Filed by Nether Industries, Inc.. (Dod, Barry)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nether Industries, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/18/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/18/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5599178 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC against Nether Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons). (Peterson, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC v. Nether Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgetown Natural Foods, LLC
Represented By: Kurt Charles Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Nether Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Barry W. Dod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: LaBreck Stainless Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?