Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. The Rodriguez Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: City of Waldport and The Rodriguez Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01886
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Kyle A. Sturm appearing on behalf of The Rodriguez Corporation Filed by on behalf of The Rodriguez Corporation. (Sturm, Kyle)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Nicholas A. Thede appearing on behalf of The Rodriguez Corporation Filed by on behalf of The Rodriguez Corporation. (Thede, Nicholas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by City of Waldport. (Diaz, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by The Rodriguez Corporation. (Zahniser, Jacob)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by City of Waldport. (Diaz, Richard)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Waldport. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Rodriguez Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5611704 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Houston Specialty Insurance Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Document Summons to Waldport, #3 Proposed Document Summons to The Rodriguez Corp.). (Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Specialty Insurance Company v. The Rodriguez Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waldport
Represented By: Richard S. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rodriguez Corporation
Represented By: Jacob A. Zahniser
Represented By: Kyle A. Sturm
Represented By: Nicholas A. Thede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric Jay Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?