Ferry v. Doohan et al
Plaintiff: Richard Ferry
Defendant: Brooke Vice, Joe Simich, John and Jane Does 1-20, Cassandra Peterson, Kevin Doohan and Steve Berger
Case Number: 3:2018cv01891
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #26 . Plaintiff's Response is due by 1/8/2019. Defendants' Reply is taken under advisement as of 1/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ps1)
December 18, 2018 Filing 36 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Richard Ferry. (ecp)
December 18, 2018 Filing 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss #26 . Filed by Richard Ferry. (ecp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 34 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Richard Ferry regarding Order 33 . (joha)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration #32 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ps1)
November 29, 2018 Filing 32 Motion for Reconsideration. Filed by Richard Ferry. (joha)
November 29, 2018 Filing 31 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Richard Ferry regarding Order 21 . (joha)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion #24 to file UNDER SEAL the unredacted version of the email attachment omitted from the Declaration of Brook Vice, and access to this document is limited to the Court, counsel, and the parties. However, the Court STRIKES the submission as unnecessary to the Court's decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and FINDS MOOT Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion for Protective Order #27 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (jp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION & ORDER. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 2). Signed on 11/28/2018 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). (jp)
November 27, 2018 Filing 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion for Protective Order #24 . Filed by Richard Ferry. (ecp)
November 26, 2018 Filing 26 Motion to Dismiss . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Steve Berger, Brooke Vice, Cassandra Peterson, Kevin Doohan, Joe Simich. (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 23, 2018 Filing 25 Declaration of Kimberly A. Stuart . Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order #24 .) (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 23, 2018 Filing 24 Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #19 . Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/26/2018. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ps1)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 Memorandum of Points in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time. Filed by Richard Ferry. (joha)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument held regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . Motion is taken under advisement as of 11/19/2018. Richard Ferry appeared Pro Se. Kimberly Stuart present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (Copy emailed to Plaintiff). (jp) Modified on 11/20/2018 to correct filing date (jp).
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 Declaration of Kimberly A. Stuart . Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #19 .) (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 19, 2018 Filing 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Steve Berger, Brooke Vice, Cassandra Peterson, Kevin Doohan, Joe Simich. (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 Declaration of Nellie McDonald in Support of County Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #15 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 Declaration of Cassandra Petersen in Support of County Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #15 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 Declaration of Brooke Vice is Support of County Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #15 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderMotion for Preliminary Injunction #2 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Steve Berger, Kevin Doohan, Cassandra Peterson, Joe Simich, Brooke Vice. (Stuart, Kimberly)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Richard Ferry regarding Order 13 . (joha)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's motion is due by 11/15/2018. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ps1)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of E-Mailing to Plaintiff regarding Scheduling 11 . (jp)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 . Oral Argument is set for 11/19/2018 at 03:00PM in Portland Courtroom 15A before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Brooke Vice served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 11/19/2018. (ecp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Joe Simich served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 11/19/2018. (ecp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Cassandra Peterson served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 11/19/2018. (ecp)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Kevin Doohan served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 11/19/2018. (ecp) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct file date(ecp).
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Steve Berger served on 10/29/2018, answer due on 11/19/2018. (ecp) Modified on 10/31/2018 to correct file date (ecp).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 , with a briefing schedule on Plaintiffs request for preliminary injunctive relief to be set by further Order of the Court. Signed on 10/30/18 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed copy to plaintiff) (dsg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Richard Ferry regarding Discovery order, #3 . (ecp)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Richard Ferry. (ecp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 80560.Summons issued as to defendants. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Ferry against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Issued Summons). (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferry v. Doohan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Vice
Represented By: Kimberly Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Simich
Represented By: Kimberly Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Peterson
Represented By: Kimberly Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Doohan
Represented By: Kimberly Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Berger
Represented By: Kimberly Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?