United States of America v. Hampton

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Ronald V Hampton, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01955
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by United States of America. (Bickers, Kathleen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 STRICKEN - AUSA WILL SERVE COPY OF ORDER - Clerk's Notice of Mailing regarding Order to Show Cause #5 to Ronald V. Hampton, Jr. on 11/13/2018. (mja) Modified on 11/13/2018 (mja).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause - A Show Cause Hearing is set for 12/17/2018 at 03:30PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Signed on 11/13/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Ronald V. Hampton regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (rs)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Heather Buss . Filed by United States of America. (Related document(s): Petition to Enforce IRS Summons #1 .) (Bickers, Kathleen)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed by United States of America against Ronald V Hampton, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bickers, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Kathleen Louise Bickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald V Hampton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?