Tabak v. Alpha Media LLC

Plaintiff: Alec Tabak
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01963
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #6 is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/8/2019. Deadline to join parties, amend pleadings, and complete discovery is 5/13/2019. Dispositive motions, if any, and Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report are due by 6/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Alpha Media LLC. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Extension of Deadlines in Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Alec Tabak against Alpha Media LLC. (Stevens, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (joha)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alpha Media LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/13/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (joha)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5631774 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-013-887--Troy Ave 2 5/31/16--Alec Tabak. Filed by Alec Tabak against Alpha Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment Notification of filing and determination of actions). (Stevens, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabak v. Alpha Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Tabak
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Represented By: Susan D. Marmaduke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?