Emerson v. Dressing Vintage LLC

Plaintiff: Sam Emerson
Defendant: Dressing Vintage LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01965
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2018 Filing 4 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Sam Emerson against Dressing Vintage LLC. (Stevens, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dressing Vintage LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/14/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (rs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5631975 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 2-087-503--01807088.jpg--Sam Emerson. Filed by Sam Emerson against Dressing Vintage LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment Notification of filing and determination of actions). (Stevens, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson v. Dressing Vintage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Emerson
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dressing Vintage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?