Pidasheff et al v. Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington et al

Plaintiff: Elena Pidasheff and Victor Pidasheff
Defendant: Does I through V, corporations, Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington, OCWEN Loan Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association and Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01986
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 29 Declaration of Barbara L. Bollero . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #28 .) (Bollero, Barbara)
January 8, 2019 28 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Bollero, Barbara)
January 7, 2019 30 Notice re Complaint filed as "Claimant's Declaration of Errata", #1 Filed by Elena Pidasheff, Victor Pidasheff. (Related document(s): Complaint, #1 .) (rs)
January 3, 2019 27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss AND JOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #23 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 Request for Rule 26(f) Conference. Filed by Elena Pidasheff, Victor Pidasheff. (rs)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ECF #24 ) is GRANTED. Response is due by 1/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 2, 2019 26 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Elena Pidasheff. (rs)
December 27, 2018 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss AND JOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #23 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 . Filed by Elena Pidasheff, Victor Pidasheff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rs)
December 26, 2018 23 Motion to Dismiss AND JOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association, OCWEN Loan Services, LLC. (Edling, Emilie)
December 20, 2018 22 Notice re Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #21 .) (Bollero, Barbara)
December 20, 2018 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Bollero, Barbara)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER - Defendant SunTrust Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #18 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/21/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER - Defendants U.S. Bank, National Association as Trustee for the Lehman XS Trust Mortgage Passthrough Certificates Series 2006-10N and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #17 is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 12/26/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 13, 2018 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Bollero, Barbara)
December 10, 2018 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association, OCWEN Loan Services, LLC. (Labrecque, Amber)
December 10, 2018 16 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
December 6, 2018 15 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Victor and Elena Pidasheff regarding Order on Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice,,, #14 . (ecp)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Barbara L. Bollero for Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5659090 issued. Signed on 12/6/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
December 6, 2018 13 Corrected Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Barbara L. Bollero . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-5659090. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Marshall, Ann)
December 6, 2018 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Barbara L. Bollero . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5659090. Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Marshall, Ann)
December 6, 2018 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Marshall, Ann)
December 6, 2018 10 Notice of Appearance of Ann T. Marshall appearing on behalf of Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.. (Marshall, Ann)
November 30, 2018 9 Notice of Appearance of Amber L. Labrecque appearing on behalf of OCWEN Loan Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association Filed by on behalf of OCWEN Loan Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Labrecque, Amber)
November 26, 2018 8 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Summons Issued #2 on Suntrust Mortgage, Inc. served on 11/21/2018 Filed by Elena Pidasheff. (rs)
November 26, 2018 7 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Summons Issued #2 on OCWEN Loan Services, LLC served on 11/19/2018 Filed by Elena Pidasheff. (rs)
November 26, 2018 6 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Summons Issued #2 on U.S. Bank National Association served on 11/20/2018 Filed by Elena Pidasheff. (rs)
November 26, 2018 5 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Summons Issued #2 on Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington served on 11/19/2018. Filed by Elena Pidasheff. (rs)
November 26, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
November 26, 2018 3 Notice of Appearance of John M. Thomas appearing on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington Filed by on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington. (Thomas, John)
November 15, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to OCWEN Loan Services, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington, Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (jn)
November 15, 2018 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 80889. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Elena Pidasheff, Victor Pidasheff against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment, #2 Attachment Attachment, #3 Attachment Attachment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pidasheff et al v. Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I through V, corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation Washington
Represented By: John M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Amber L. Labrecque
Represented By: Emilie K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Amber L. Labrecque
Represented By: Emilie K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Barbara L. Bollero
Represented By: Ann T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Pidasheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Pidasheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?