Storkson v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Britt Storkson
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02039
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Britt Storkson. (Fuller, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/29/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/29/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #3 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 1/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Google LLC. (Healy, Melissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Google LLC. (Healy, Melissa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5645001 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Google LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Healy, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storkson v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Storkson
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Laura E. Rosenbaum
Represented By: Melissa J. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?