Cederberg et al v. Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cederberg and Hayley Shelton
Defendant: Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency, Legacy Health, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Paula Peterson, Mayor Dennis Doyle, Director Kelly Dutra, Fire Chief Michael Kinkade, Deputy Eric Stoneberg, M.D. Timothy David Zeigler, City Manager Marty Wine, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Sheriff Pat Garrett, Washington County, Assistant County Mgr Don Bohn, Fire Chief Mike Duyck, Dennis Doyle, Kinsey Coyne, Jon Nolan, Don Bohn, Elizabeth Smith, Kathryn Fischer, Breck Park-Burson, Timothy David Zeigler, M.D., Allison Orsborn, Jason Marceau, Melissa Procaccini, John/Jane Does 2-9, Michael Kinkade, Stephanie Lee, Mike Duyck, Eric Stoneberg, Jessica McKenzie, Monique Roberts, Tony A Cowger, Pat Garrett, Kelly Dutra and Marty Wine
Case Number: 3:2018cv02044
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 29 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Nicholas Cederberg, Hayley Shelton. (Park, David)
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Raechelle Ottosen . Filed by Don Bohn, Tony A Cowger, Kinsey Coyne, Dennis Doyle, Kelly Dutra, Mike Duyck, Kathryn Fischer, Michael Kinkade, Stephanie Lee, Jason Marceau, Jessica McKenzie, Jon Nolan, Allison Orsborn, Breck Park-Burson, Paula Peterson, Melissa Procaccini, Monique Roberts, Elizabeth Smith, Marty Wine. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #27 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Kraemer, Steven)
January 18, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Don Bohn, Jon Nolan, Kathryn Fischer, Elizabeth Smith, Michael Kinkade, Jason Marceau, Kinsey Coyne, Stephanie Lee, Dennis Doyle, Mike Duyck, Jessica McKenzie, Tony A Cowger, Paula Peterson, Kelly Dutra, Breck Park-Burson, Melissa Procaccini, Monique Roberts, Marty Wine, Allison Orsborn. (Kraemer, Steven)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Marco A. Hernandez: GRANTING the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (#25 ). Answer is due by 1/18/2019. (eo)
December 28, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Don Bohn, Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency, Jon Nolan, Kathryn Fischer, Elizabeth Smith, Michael Kinkade, Jason Marceau, Kinsey Coyne, Stephanie Lee, Dennis Doyle, Mike Duyck, Jessica McKenzie, Tony A Cowger, Paula Peterson, Kelly Dutra, Breck Park-Burson, Melissa Procaccini, Monique Roberts, Marty Wine, Allison Orsborn. (Kraemer, Steven)
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Don Bohn served on 12/28/2018; Tony A Cowger served on 12/28/2018; Kinsey Coyne served on 12/28/2018; Dennis Doyle served on 12/28/2018; Kelly Dutra served on 12/28/2018; Mike Duyck served on 12/28/2018; Kathryn Fischer served on 12/28/2018; John/Jane Does 2-9 served on 12/28/2018; Michael Kinkade served on 12/28/2018; Stephanie Lee served on 12/28/2018; Jason Marceau served on 12/28/2018; Jessica McKenzie served on 12/28/2018; Jon Nolan served on 12/28/2018; Allison Orsborn served on 12/28/2018; Breck Park-Burson served on 12/28/2018; Paula Peterson served on 12/28/2018; Melissa Procaccini served on 12/28/2018; Monique Roberts served on 12/28/2018; Elizabeth Smith served on 12/28/2018; Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency served on 12/28/2018; Marty Wine served on 12/28/2018 Tonya Cowger served on 12/28/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Park, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 23 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading #19 is GRANTED. Response to complaint by Defendants Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, and Timothy Zeigler, now due January 28, 2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (pvh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 21 Amended Proposed Summons Re Tonya Cowger Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Park, David)
December 24, 2018 Filing 20 Declaration of Jamie E. Valentine in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Filed by Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Timothy David Zeigler, M.D.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #19 .) (Valentine, Jamie)
December 24, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Filed by Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Timothy David Zeigler, M.D.. (Valentine, Jamie)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Peter O. Tuenge appearing on behalf of Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Timothy David Zeigler, M.D. Filed by on behalf of Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Timothy David Zeigler, M.D.. (Tuenge, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Conference held regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery of Personal Health Information #7 . The Court DENIED Plaintiff's motion and instructed Plaintiff to issue a subpoena duces tecum for the records. The Court approved a date for responding to the subpoena 21 days from service of the subpoena. David D. Park and Nelson R. Hall present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Christopher A. Gilmore for Washington County, et al, and Jamie E. Valentine for Legacy Health, et al present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Marco A. Hernandez presiding. (jp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Northwest Acute Care Specialists, PC. Filed by Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C.. (Valentine, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, and Legacy Health. Filed by Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital. (Valentine, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Jamie E. Valentine appearing on behalf of Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Timothy David Zeigler, M.D. and appearance of Peter O. Tuenge Filed by on behalf of Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Timothy David Zeigler, M.D.. (Valentine, Jamie)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez regarding Motion to Compel Discovery of Personal Health Information #7 . A telephone conference on this motion is set for 12/18/2018 at 01:30PM. The parties shall call into the Court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C. served on 12/6/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Park, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon Legacy Meridian Park Hospital served on 12/6/2018 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Park, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Legacy Health served on 12/6/2018 Filed by Nicholas Cederberg; Hayley Shelton. (Park, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Timothy David Zeigler, M.D. served on 12/11/2018 Filed by Nicholas Cederberg; Hayley Shelton. (Park, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eric Stoneberg waiver sent on 12/4/2018; Pat Garrett waiver sent on 12/4/2018; Washington County waiver sent on 12/4/2018. Filed by Eric Stoneberg; Pat Garrett; Washington County. (Gilmore, Christopher)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to Compel Discovery of Personal Health Information. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Nicholas Cederberg. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in support of motion, #2 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Compel) (Hall, Nelson)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Tony A Cowger, Kinsey Coyne, Kathryn Fischer, Stephanie Lee, Jason Marceau, Jessica McKenzie, Jon Nolan, Allison Orsborn, Breck Park-Burson, Melissa Procaccini, Monique Roberts, Elizabeth Smith. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Complaint . Filed by Nicholas Cederberg, Hayley Shelton against Monique Roberts, BRECK PARK-BURSON, KINSEY COYNE, STEPHANIE LEE, JESSICA MCKENZIE, KATHRYN FISCHER, ALLISON ORSBORN, JASON MARCEAU, MELISSA PROCACCINI, Elizabeth Smith, TONY A. COWGER, JON NOLAN (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (Park, David)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Notice to Counsel: Judge Hernandez expects the vast majority of civil cases in which all parties are represented by counsel, to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing. Additional information about case scheduling and guidelines for civil cases assigned to Judge Hernandez may be found on his page on the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon website: https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/judge-hernandez. (jp)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Don Bohn, Dennis Doyle, Kelly Dutra, Mike Duyck, Pat Garrett, Michael Kinkade, Legacy Health, Legacy Meridian Park Hospital, Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C., Paula Peterson, Eric Stoneberg, Washington County, Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency, Marty Wine, Timothy David Zeigler, M.D.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/26/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/26/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (Payment of $400.00 Recieved. Reciept Number 0979-5645475 Issued) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nicholas Cederberg, Hayley Shelton against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Park, David) Added Payment Information on 11/26/2018 (joha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cederberg et al v. Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Consolidated Communications Agency
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Health
Represented By: Peter O. Tuenge
Represented By: Jamie E. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Acute Care Specialists, P.C.
Represented By: Peter O. Tuenge
Represented By: Jamie E. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Peterson
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Dennis Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kelly Dutra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Chief Michael Kinkade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Eric Stoneberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Timothy David Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Manager Marty Wine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Meridian Park Hospital
Represented By: Peter O. Tuenge
Represented By: Jamie E. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Pat Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County
Represented By: Christopher A. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant County Mgr Don Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Chief Mike Duyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Doyle
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinsey Coyne
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Nolan
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Bohn
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Fischer
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breck Park-Burson
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy David Zeigler, M.D.
Represented By: Peter O. Tuenge
Represented By: Jamie E. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Orsborn
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Marceau
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Procaccini
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 2-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kinkade
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Lee
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Duyck
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Stoneberg
Represented By: Christopher A. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica McKenzie
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Roberts
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony A Cowger
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Garrett
Represented By: Christopher A. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Dutra
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Wine
Represented By: Steven A. Kraemer
Represented By: David C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cederberg
Represented By: Nelson R. Hall
Represented By: David D. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayley Shelton
Represented By: Nelson R. Hall
Represented By: David D. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?