82nd Avenue Limited Partnership v. Victaulic Company
Plaintiff: 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership
Defendant: Victaulic Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02125
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Victaulic Company served on 12/18/2018 Filed by 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership. (Evans, Megan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership. (Evans, Megan)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/13/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership. (Evans, Megan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5665264 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership against Victaulic Company. (Evans, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership v. Victaulic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 82nd Avenue Limited Partnership
Represented By: Angela M. Otto
Represented By: Megan Margaret Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victaulic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?