Crowe et al v. Oregon State Bar et al
Plaintiff: Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys, Daniel Z Crowe, Lawrence K Peterson, Lawrence K. Peterson and Daniel Z. Crowe
Defendant: Oregon State Bar Board of Governors, Oregon State Bar, Christine Constantino, Keith Palevsky, Vanessa A. Nordyke, Helen Hierschbiel and Amber Hollister
Case Number: 3:2018cv02139
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Daniel Z. Crowe, Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys, Lawrence K. Peterson. (Huebert, Jacob)
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of W. Michael Gillette appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Gillette, W.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants' Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss #15 on the Oral Argument Calendar of 3/13/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Megan K. Houlihan appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Houlihan, Megan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Steven M. Wilker appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Wilker, Steven)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Richman, Taylor)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Telephone Conference held 12/20/18. Order: Defendants will file their responsive pleadings by 1/9/2019. To the extent that Plaintiff intends to file a motion for partial summary judgment in this action, such motion will be due as well on 1/9/2019. Responses to any motions to dismiss and for partial summary judgment will be due by 1/30/2019. Replies to responses will be due by 2/13/2019. Oral argument on motions to dismiss and for partial summary judgment, once filed, will be set for 3/13/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Order: The Oregon Attorney General is allowed to appear in this case as Amicus Curiae and may file an Amicus Brief at a time deemed appropriate. Aditya Dynar; Jacob Huebert; Luke Miller present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Steven Wilker; Taylor Richmond (for Alexander Naito); Elisa Dozono; Megan Houlihan; W. Michael Gillette present as counsel for defendant(s). Sarah Weston; Henry Kantor present as counsel for Amicus. Court Reporter: (None). (Courtesy copy of this order will be sent via e-mail to defense counsel and amicus counsel, who have yet to formally appear.) (gm)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephone Conference for 12/20/2018 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jacob Huebert (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jhuebert. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Huebert for Daniel Z. Crowe, Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys, and Lawrence K. Peterson. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 26E3RNE8 issued. Signed on 12/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Aditya Dynar (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: adynar. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aditya Dynar for Daniel Z. Crowe, Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys, and Lawrence K. Peterson. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5668910 issued. Signed on 12/17/2018 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
December 16, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob Huebert . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 26E3RNE8. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Luke)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/15/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/13/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys. (Miller, Luke)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aditya Dynar . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5668910. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Luke)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob Huebert . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5668906. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Luke)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5668023 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Daniel Z Crowe, Lawrence K Peterson, Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Attachment Corporate Disclosure Statement). (Miller, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowe et al v. Oregon State Bar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Bar Board of Governors
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Bar
Represented By: W. Michael Gillette
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Constantino
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Palevsky
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa A. Nordyke
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Hierschbiel
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Hollister
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Represented By: Megan K. Houlihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oregon Civil Liberties Attorneys
Represented By: Luke D. Miller
Represented By: Aditya Dynar
Represented By: Jacob Huebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Z Crowe
Represented By: Luke D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence K Peterson
Represented By: Luke D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence K. Peterson
Represented By: Luke D. Miller
Represented By: Aditya Dynar
Represented By: Jacob Huebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Z. Crowe
Represented By: Luke D. Miller
Represented By: Aditya Dynar
Represented By: Jacob Huebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?