Fulgencio v. Lam Research Corporation
Plaintiff: Marc E. Fulgencio
Defendant: Lam Research Corporation
Claimant: Marc E Fulgencio
Case Number: 3:2018cv02195
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, March 20, 2019, at 10:00 AM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. The parties are to use land-line telephones, as the Court prohibits the use of speaker phones, cell phones and headsets. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by 10:00 AM on March 19, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #4 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Lam Research Corporation. (Symes, David)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #7 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/4/2019. Ordered on 1/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Appear. Filed by Lam Research Corporation. (Symes, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Association of Attorney Matthew C. Ellis,Matthew C. Ellis for Marc E. Fulgencio. Filed by Marc E. Fulgencio. (Ellis, Matthew)
January 6, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon Lam Research Corporation served on 12/30/2018 Filed by Marc E. Fulgencio. (O'Neil, Shawn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Marc E. Fulgencio against Lam Research Corporation. (O'Neil, Shawn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lam Research Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/20/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/20/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5677059 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Marc E Fulgencio against Lam Research Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (O'Neil, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulgencio v. Lam Research Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marc E Fulgencio
Represented By: Shawn M. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lam Research Corporation
Represented By: David P. R. Symes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc E. Fulgencio
Represented By: Shawn M. O'Neil
Represented By: Matthew C. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?