Edible Arrangements, LLC et al v. Nancy's Floral, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edible IP, LLC and Edible Arrangements, LLC
Defendant: Nancy's Floral, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02198
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #8 upon Nancy's Floral, Inc. served on 1/3/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jonathan Z. King (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jzking. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Z. King for Edible Arrangements, LLC and Edible IP, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5678138 issued. Signed on 1/3/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Meichelle R. MacGregor (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mrmacgregor. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meichelle MacGregor for Edible Arrangements, LLC and Edible IP, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5678132. issued. Signed on 1/3/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper.. (Attachments: #1 Trademark Exhibit) (jtj)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nancy's Floral, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jtj)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Z. King . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5678138. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meichelle MacGregor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5678132. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,, #1 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5678064 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 4319940--4/16/2013--Edible Arrangements, LLC, 5614310--11/27/2018--Edible Arrangements, LLC, 87698471--11/27/2017--Edible IP, LLC, 87726646--12/19/2017--Edible IP, LLC, 87166534--9/9/2016--Edible Arrangements, LLC. Filed by Edible Arrangements, LLC, Edible IP, LLC against Edible Arrangements, LLC, Edible IP, LLC. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edible Arrangements, LLC et al v. Nancy's Floral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edible IP, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Meichelle MacGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edible Arrangements, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick
Represented By: Jonathan Z. King
Represented By: Meichelle MacGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy's Floral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?