Wilburn v. Boeing Company

Plaintiff: Lee Wilburn
Defendant: Boeing Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02200
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Lee Wilburn. (Farrell, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph R. Lewis for Boeing Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 26E8928K issued. Signed on 1/8/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Jon Hendricks for Boeing Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. : 0979-5678356. issued. Signed on 1/8/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #6 & #7 , Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The PDFs attached to these entries at filing were incorrect. The applications were submitted using outdated forms. Corrected PDFs have been uploaded and have replaced the incorrect attachments. The Notices of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (eo)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Boeing Company. (Barrett, James)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/20/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/20/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph R. Lewis . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 26E8928K. Filed by The Boeing Company. (Barrett, James) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/27/2018) (eo).
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Jon Hendricks . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5678356. Filed by The Boeing Company. (Barrett, James) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/27/2018) (eo).
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph R. Lewis . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 26E8928K. Filed by The Boeing Company. (Barrett, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by The Boeing Company. (Barrett, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Declaration of Erica Loud in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court. Filed by The Boeing Company. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barrett, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of James M. Barrett in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court. Filed by The Boeing Company. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket as of 12/19/18, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Service) (Barrett, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV53842 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5678270 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Barrett, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilburn v. Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: James M. Barrett
Represented By: Joseph R. Lewis
Represented By: Robert Jon Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Wilburn
Represented By: Elizabeth Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?