Aponte v. Florida Department of Corrections

Petitioner: Richard R. Aponte
Respondent: Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Richard R. Aponte. (kms)
February 15, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 82312 issued. (joha)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 is DENIED.Petitioner may file an amended application within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed on 1/28/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed order and IFP application to petitioner) (dsg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed copy to petitioner) (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Richard R. Aponte. (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Richard R. Aponte against Florida Department of Corrections. (dsg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Richard R. Aponte. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aponte v. Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard R. Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?