Biggs v. U.S. Bank National Association

Plaintiff: Keith Biggs
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv00052
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING an in-person Rule 16 Conference for Monday, 5/6/2019 at 09:30AM in Judge Acosta's chambers on the 11th floor of the Mark Hatfield United States Courthouse, 1000 SW 3rd Ave., Portland, Oregon 97204. (peg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to #5 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Warberg, Jennifer)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on U.S. Bank National Association served on 1/15/2019 Filed by Keith Biggs. (McCulloch, Sue-Del)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Bank National Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Keith Biggs. (McCulloch, Sue-Del)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Keith Biggs. (McCulloch, Sue-Del)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Complaint . Filed by Keith Biggs against U.S. Bank National Association. (McCulloch, Sue-Del)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/14/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/13/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/13/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Warberg, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Jennifer Warberg In Support of Notice of Removal to Federal Court [Dkt No. 1]. Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Warberg, Jennifer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV52024 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5698042 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by U.S. Bancorp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Warberg, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggs v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Jennifer Neth Warberg
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jennifer Neth Warberg
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Biggs
Represented By: Sue-Del McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?