Medmar Inc. v. Anglo Eastern Navigation PTE et al
Plaintiff: Medmar Inc.
Defendant: Midstar FZE, Alsaeed Trading Company, Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A. and Anglo Eastern Navigation PTE
Case Number: 3:2019cv00083
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Consent to Release Cargo From Attachment Filed by Medmar Inc.. (Holder, Valerie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by Medmar Inc.. (Holder, Valerie)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Settlement Conference held 2/4/19. Case does not settle at this time. John Giffin present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Garrett Garfield, Chris Nolan, Chris Hart, Jess Webster present as counsel for listed defendants (who have yet to formally appear). Court Reporter: (None). (gm)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting a Settlement Conference for 2/4/2019 at 9:30AM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Counsel for each side are to submit a confidential letter via e-mail to Judge Papak (using the e-mail address: "PKpropdoc@ord.uscourts.gov") not later than noon on 1/31/2019 which includes: 1) a brief outline (not argument) of the issues involved in the case; 2) your current position regarding settlement; 3) the last settlement offer made by each party; and 4) any settlement proposal you would agree to make to conclude the matter at this time. Counsel should bring their clients to the conference (or otherwise have them be available by telephone as expressed in prior e-mails to counsel) and should also bring or have available for immediate conference anyone who retains final settlement authority. (gm)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: All parties present at the 01/23/19 hearing for Case No. 3:18-cv-02076-MO, and any parties named in Case No. 3:19-cv-00083-MO are ordered to submit mediation briefs to Judge Papak by the time frame indicated in his forthcoming settlement conference scheduling order and be prepared to attend mediation on the designated date should Judge Papak require their presence. Overseas clients may appear telephonically as long as they are readily available to be contacted as needed during the conference. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT. (kms)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT Signed on 1/23/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVER. Signed on 1/23/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for John D. Giffin (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jdgiffin. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. Giffin for Medmar Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5708603 issued. Signed on 1/22/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. Giffin . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5708603. Filed by Medmar Inc.. (Holder, Valerie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alsaeed Trading Company, Anglo Eastern Navigation PTE, Midstar FZE, Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by MEDMAR INC.. (Holder, Valerie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Valerie I. Holder . Filed by MEDMAR INC.. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint #3 .) (Holder, Valerie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Appoint Process Server . Filed by MEDMAR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holder, Valerie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Filed by MEDMAR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document, #2 Proposed Order) (Holder, Valerie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint. for Attachment of Cargo Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5704605 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by MEDMAR INC. against ALSAEED TRADING COMPANY, ANGLO EASTERN NAVIGATION PTE, MIDSTAR FZE, Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Civil Cover Sheet). (Holder, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medmar Inc. v. Anglo Eastern Navigation PTE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstar FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alsaeed Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigorous Shipping & Trading S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anglo Eastern Navigation PTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medmar Inc.
Represented By: Valerie I. Holder
Represented By: John D. Giffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?