De Jaray et al v. Lattice Semiconductor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY, DARRELL R. OSWALD and PERIENNE DE JARAY
Defendant: Lattice Semiconductor Corporation and John and Jane Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2019cv00086
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: The Court grants Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corp's Motion to Compel #93 . Mr. de Jaray shall answer Defendant's Interrogatory Nos. 13 and 14, under oath, within 14 days of this order. Signed on 10/21/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (cw)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Declaration of EUGENE BARASH . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Sur-Reply to Motion #113 .) (Anderson-Dana, Lydia)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Declaration of Thomas Andrukonis . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Sur-Reply to Motion #113 .) (Anderson-Dana, Lydia)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Declaration of Joshua Berman . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Sur-Reply to Motion #113 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17) (Anderson-Dana, Lydia)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion #109 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Anderson-Dana, Lydia)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Scheduling Order - Plaintiffs' unopposed request for an extension of time to file a sur-reply to Defendants' motion to compel answers to interrogatories 13 and 14 (ECF #93 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' sur-reply is due by October 7, 2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Supplemental Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of Lattice's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 13 and 14. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #109 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 45) (Aldrich, Nicholas)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Declaration of Ryan Fayhee in Support of Lattice's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 13 and 14. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #109 .) (Aldrich, Nicholas)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Reply in Support of to Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 13 and 14 #93 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Notice of Association of Attorney Lydia Anderson-Dana,Lydia Anderson-Dana for Steven A.W. De Jaray,Lydia Anderson-Dana for Darrell R. Oswald,Lydia Anderson-Dana for Perienne De Jaray. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Anderson-Dana, Lydia)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Corrected Exhibits # 5 re Declaration,, #102 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5) (Mueller, Keil)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER - The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (ECF #104 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) Discovery is to be completed by January 28, 2022; (2) the Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for October 8, 2021 is RESET to February 11, 2022 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry; (3) Opening Expert Reports are due by March 4, 2022; (4) Rebuttal Expert Reports are due by April 8, 2022; (5) Expert Discovery to be completed by May 6, 2022; and (6) Dispositive Motions are due by June 17, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Exhibits 1-2, 5-9 and 11 to Joshua Berman Declaration re Declaration,, #102 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 11) (Mueller, Keil)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Declaration of Joshua Berman in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #99 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 - Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit 7 - Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit 8 - Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 - Cover Sheet) (Mueller, Keil)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Declaration of John W. Bascariol. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #99 .) (Mueller, Keil)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Declaration of Daniel M. Fisher-Owens. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #99 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Mueller, Keil)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 13 and 14 #93 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Matthew J. Kalmanson and Jason R. Poss . Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Defendant's Motion to Compel (ECF #96 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is due by August 6, 2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 13 and 14 #93 . Filed by Perienne De Jaray, Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald. (Mueller, Keil)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Declaration of Derek F. Foran - Confidential Exhibits. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion to Compel #93 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit 24, #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 27) (Kalmanson, Matthew)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of Defendant Lattice's Motion to Compel. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion to Compel #93 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31) (Kalmanson, Matthew)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories 13 and 14. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Spencer McManus Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Brewer, Robin)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTES of Proceedings: Discovery Telephone Conference held. The parties' discovery issues set forth in emails to the Court discussed on the record. The Court granted leave to both parties to file motions to compel after counsel participate in a good faith telephone conference for at least 30 minutes. Isaac Glassman, Joshua Berman and Keil Mueller present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Derek Foran, Matthew Kalmanson and Robin Brewer present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (jp)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Robert L. Cortez Webb and Madeleine E. Gully Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Brewer, Robin)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Randall Zack (ECF #88 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Randall Zack. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8073769. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Zack, Randall)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Randall Zack. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8073769 #88 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Status of discovery discussed as stated on the record. ORDER - Setting a further Telephone Conference for 6/28/2021 at 03:00PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Colin McCann Ceriello, Joshua A. Berman, and Keil M. Mueller present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Derek F. Foran, Janet Schroer, and Madeleine E. Gully present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Robin L. Brewer (ECF #84 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Madeleine Gully (ECF #83 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robin L. Brewer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8071573. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Brewer, Robin)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Madeleine Gully. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8071492. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Gully, Madeleine)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Madeleine Gully. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8071492 #83 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Robin L. Brewer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8071573 #84 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Scheduling Order - At the Defendants' request, the Court sets a Telephone Conference to discuss a discovery matter for 5/6/2021 at 03:00PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Notice of Appearance of Jason R. Poss appearing on behalf of Lattice Semiconductor Corporation Filed by on behalf of Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Poss, Jason)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Appearance of Jack R. Scholz Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Colin Ceriello (ECF #75 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Isaac Glassman (ECF #74 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Scott T. Weingaertner (ECF #73 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Joshua A. Berman (ECF #72 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Joshua Berman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7923712 #72 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott T. Weingaertner. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7923815 #73 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Colin Ceriello. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7924062 #75 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Isaac Glassman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7924013 #74 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Colin Ceriello. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7924062. Filed by Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald, Perienne De Jaray. (Ceriello, Colin)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Isaac Glassman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7924013. Filed by Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald, Perienne De Jaray. (Glassman, Isaac)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Scott T. Weingaertner. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7923815. Filed by Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald, Perienne De Jaray. (Weingaertner, Scott)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Joshua Berman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7923712. Filed by Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald, Perienne De Jaray. (Berman, Joshua)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Joshua Berman, Scott T. Weingaertner and Isaac S. Glassman is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Douglas F. Stewart; Carlton Wilde, III; Philip J. Bezanson and Phillip L. Sampson, Jr Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - The parties' joint motion to modify case schedule (ECF #69 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) Discovery is to be completed by September 24, 2021; (2) the telephone Scheduling Conference set for April 5, 2021 is RESET to October 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.; the Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry; (3) expert reports are due by October 29, 2021; (4) rebuttal reports are due by December 3, 2021; (5) expert discovery to be completed by January 14, 2022; and (6) dispositive motions are due by February 25, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil) Modified on 2/3/2021 to correct event type (mja).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - The parties' joint motion to modify case schedule (ECF #67 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) Fact discovery to be completed by 3/31/2021; (2) the telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 is reset to 4/5/2021 at 01:30PM; The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry; (3) expert reports are due by 4/30/2021; (4) rebuttal reports are due by 6/11/2021; (5) expert discovery to be completed by 7/16/2021; and (6) dispositive motions are due by 8/20/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Schedule. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil) Modified on 10/13/2020 (mja).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery dispute discussed as stated on the record. Carlton Wilde, III and Philip J. Bezanson present as counsel for Plaintiff(s). Derek F. Foran, Robert L. Cortez Webb, and Jack R. Scholz present as counsel for Defendant(s). Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - At the Defendant's request, the Court is setting a Telephone Conference to discuss a discovery dispute for 10/1/2020 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - Granting Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corporations' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF #63 ) for Attorney Spencer McManus. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Spencer McManus. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7073150 #63 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Spencer McManus. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7073150. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scholz, Jack)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: of Appearance of George C. Harris Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Webb, Robert)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Joint Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed on 3/25/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Supplemental Case Management Order Regarding Contested Motions. Signed 1/31/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE RULE 16 CONFERENCE: ORDER - The Court adopts in-part the parties' proposed case management schedule (ECF #54 ) as follows: (1) initial disclosures are due by 2/7/2020; (2) fact discovery to be completed by 11/20/2020; (3) a Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 11/23/2020 at 1:00PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry; (4) opening expert reports are due by 12/15/2020; (5) any rebuttal reports are due by 2/12/2021; (6) expert discovery to be completed by 4/9/2021; and (7) dispositive motions are due by 5/7/2021. Philip J. Bezanson, Douglas F. Stewart, and Carlton Wilde, III present as counsel for Plaintiffs. Derek F. Foran, Matthew J. Kalmanson, Jack R. Scholz, and Robert L. Cortez Webb present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ECF #56 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6195395. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6195395 #56 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #56 .) (ecp)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - At the Plaintiffs' request, the Court is setting a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for 1/31/2020 at 11:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan "Joint Report Of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference And Proposed Case Management Schedule". Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mueller, Keil)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Keil M. Mueller is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Nadia H. Dahab Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Answer to #51 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald, Perienne De Jaray against John and Jane Does 1-20, Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Dahab, Nadia)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Opinion and Order - For the reasons stated above the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (ECF #47 ). Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF #7 ) Plaintiff's original complaint is DENIED without prejudice to file a motion to dismiss against Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed on 9/20/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Reply to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #47 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #47 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Dahab, Nadia)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Phillip L. Sampson, Jr. (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: plsampson. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Phillip L. Sampson, Jr for Perienne De Jaray, Steven A.W. De Jaray, and Darrell R. Oswald. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5868478 issued. Signed on 5/29/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phillip L. Sampson Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5868478. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Douglas F. Stewart (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dfstewart. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas F. Stewart for Perienne De Jaray, Steven A.W. De Jaray, and Darrell R. Oswald. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5865139 issued. Signed on 5/28/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Philip J. Bezanson (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: pjbezanson. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip J. Bezanson for Perienne De Jaray, Steven A.W. De Jaray, and Darrell R. Oswald. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5865122 issued. Signed on 5/28/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas F. Stewart . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5865139. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip J. Bezanson . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5865122. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nadia H. Dahab is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Curt Roy Hineline Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Reply In Support of Request for Consideration of Documents Incorporated Into Complaint. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Request #9 .) (Kalmanson, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Supplemental Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #34 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10) (Kalmanson, Matthew)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Reply to Motion to Dismiss #7 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Motion to Dismiss (ECF #32 ) is GRANTED up to and including 5/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss #7 . Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Kalmanson, Matthew)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Amended Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Matthew J. Kalmanson is substituted as counsel of record Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Daniels, Brad)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Response to Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corp.'s Request for Consideration Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hineline, Curt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Declaration of Darrell R. Oswald in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #26 .) (Hineline, Curt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Declaration of Perienne de Jaray in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Perienne De Jaray, Steven A.W. De Jaray, Darrell R. Oswald. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #26 .) (Hineline, Curt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Declaration of Steven A.W. de Jaray in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #26 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - E-mails, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Order Form, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - E-mail, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Report, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Cert. of Conformance, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Products, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Email, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Email, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Press Release, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Report, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - SEC Filing) (Hineline, Curt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #7 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hineline, Curt)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corrected Request Praecipe to Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hineline, Curt)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Matthew J. Kalmanson is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Brad S. Daniels and Kennon H. Scott Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation, John and Jane Does 1-20. (Daniels, Brad)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Vacate the Discovery and Pretrial Schedule, and Continuing the Rule 26 Conference (ECF #7 ) is GRANTED. Response is due by 4/5/2019. Reply is due by 4/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss #7 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hineline, Curt)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Robert L. Cortez Webb (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rlcwebb. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Cortez Webb for Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5748486 issued. Signed on 2/25/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notification of CM/ECF Account for George C. Harris (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: gcharris. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of George C. Harris for Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5748469 issued. Signed on 2/25/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Derek F. Foran (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: dfforan. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Derek F. Foran for Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5748481 issued. Signed on 2/25/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for James P. Bennett (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jpbennett. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Bennett for Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5748453 issued. Signed on 2/25/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Derek F. Foran . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 0979-5748481. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert L. Cortez Webb . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5748486. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney George C. Harris . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5748469. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Bennett . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5748453. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Request for Consideration of Documents Incorporated Into Complaint. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Daniels, Brad)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration of Derek F. Foran in Support of Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corporation's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1/2002 Data Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2/1999 Data Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10/2009 Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - Invoices, #5 Exhibit 5 - Invoices, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email) (Daniels, Brad)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Daniels, Brad)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Defendant Lattice Semiconductor Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #5 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/20/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/17/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/17/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation. (Scott, Kennon)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV57494 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5705402 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Lattice Semiconductor Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket). (Scott, Kennon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jaray et al v. Lattice Semiconductor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN A.W. DE JARAY
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carlton Wilde, III
Represented By: Philip J. Bezanson
Represented By: Phillip L. Sampson, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas F. Stewart
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Keil M. Mueller
Represented By: Colin McCann Ceriello
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Represented By: Joshua A. Berman
Represented By: Isaac Glassman
Represented By: Lydia Anderson-Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL R. OSWALD
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carlton Wilde, III
Represented By: Philip J. Bezanson
Represented By: Phillip L. Sampson, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas F. Stewart
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Keil M. Mueller
Represented By: Colin McCann Ceriello
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Represented By: Joshua A. Berman
Represented By: Isaac Glassman
Represented By: Lydia Anderson-Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERIENNE DE JARAY
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carlton Wilde, III
Represented By: Philip J. Bezanson
Represented By: Phillip L. Sampson, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas F. Stewart
Represented By: Nadia H. Dahab
Represented By: Keil M. Mueller
Represented By: Colin McCann Ceriello
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Represented By: Joshua A. Berman
Represented By: Isaac Glassman
Represented By: Lydia Anderson-Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lattice Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Kennon H. Scott
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: George C. Harris
Represented By: Robert L. Cortez Webb
Represented By: Derek F. Foran
Represented By: James P. Bennett
Represented By: Jack R. Scholz
Represented By: Matthew J. Kalmanson
Represented By: Spencer McManus
Represented By: Robin Brewer
Represented By: Randall Zack
Represented By: Madeleine E Gully
Represented By: Jason R. Poss
Represented By: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?