Davis v. Espinoza et al
Plaintiff: Aiden Safari Davis and Parviz Safari
Defendant: Espinoza Trucking and Guillermo Espinoza
Case Number: 3:2019cv00090
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Setting a telephone Rule 16 conference for 7/16/2019 at 10:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. ORDER - The parties' joint motion for extension of discovery & PTO deadlines (ECF #7 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) Discovery is to be completed by 7/22/2019; (2) expert discovery to be completed by 9/23/2019; and (3) joint ADR report and pretrial order are due by 9/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Aiden Safari Davis. (Stimson, Brian)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Espinoza Trucking, Guillermo Espinoza. (Sweitzer, Graham)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #4 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Sweitzer, Graham)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/21/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court Filed by Guillermo Espinoza, Espinoza Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment) (Sweitzer, Graham)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5706591 issued.. Filed by Espinoza Trucking, Guillermo Espinoza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sweitzer, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Espinoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiden Safari Davis
Represented By: Brian R. Stimson
Represented By: Sean P. DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parviz Safari
Represented By: Brian R. Stimson
Represented By: Sean P. DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espinoza Trucking
Represented By: Graham M. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Espinoza
Represented By: Graham M. Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?