Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Two Dudes Entertainment LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal Inc, Springtime Music, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., No Surrender Music, a Division of Praxis International Communications, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. dba EMI Longitude Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Dynatone Publishing Company, Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc. and EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Defendant: Toby Harris, Two Dudes Entertainment LLC dba Bleachers Sports Bar and Grill fka Bleachers aka Bleachers Sports Pub and Grill aka Bleachers Grill Pub, Two Dudes Entertainment LLC, Bleachers Grill Pub and Bleachers Sports Pub and Grill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00094
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Toby Harris served on 2/28/2019, answer due on 3/21/2019. (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Two Dudes Entertainment LLC served on 1/30/2019, answer due on 2/20/2019. (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (joha) (Report Mailed to Register of Copyrights)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Two Dudes Entertainment LLC, and Toby Harris. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/20/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/17/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/17/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sss)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. dba EMI Longitude Music, Eleksylum Music, Inc., Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., No Surrender Music, a Division of Praxis International Communications, Inc., Songs of Universal Inc, Springtime Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Podwill, Loren)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5707084 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included copyrights: Eu 198587--Get Up I Feel Like Being A Sex Machine--James Brown; Bobby Byrd; Ronald Lenhoff, PA 304-742--Keep Your Hands To Yourself--Dan Baird, RE 627-422--Mustang Sally--Bonny Rice, Eu 448561--Tuesday's Gone--Allen Collins; Ronnie Van Zant. Filed by Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Springtime Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. dba EMI Longitude Music, Dynatone Publishing Company, Songs of Universal Inc, Broadcast Music, Inc., Eleksylum Music, Inc., No Surrender Music, a Division of Praxis International Communications, Inc. against Toby Harris, Two Dudes Entertainment LLC dba Bleachers Sports Bar and Grill fka Bleachers aka Bleachers Sports Pub and Grill aka Bleachers Grill Pub (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Podwill, Loren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Two Dudes Entertainment LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal Inc
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleksylum Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: No Surrender Music, a Division of Praxis International Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. dba EMI Longitude Music
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynatone Publishing Company
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourteenth Hour Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Dudes Entertainment LLC dba Bleachers Sports Bar and Grill fka Bleachers aka Bleachers Sports Pub and Grill aka Bleachers Grill Pub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Dudes Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bleachers Grill Pub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bleachers Sports Pub and Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?