Schaefer v. Mutchler et al
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Schaefer
Defendant: Craig Gabriel, Wade Mutchler, Gary Adler, Anthony Schodowski, Lourenn Cannon, Billy Williams and 1-10 Unknown Others
Case Number: 3:2019cv00123
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Intent to Appeal. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (dsg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Reconsideration of Order to Dismiss #9 . Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (joha)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 3/11/19 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/12/19.) (dsg)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO DISMISS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim and because it is frivolous. Signed on 3/11/19 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/12/19.) (dsg)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's provisional in forma pauperis status is CONFIRMED. IT IS ORDERED that trust account coordinator at FDCSEATAC or his designee shall collect payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 3/11/19 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party and SEATAC Trust Fund Coordinator on 3/12/19.) (dsg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause. Signed on 3/6/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) Copy mailed to Plaintiff on 3/6/2019. (mja)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Jason Paul Schaefer. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (Related document(s): Application for leave to proceed ifp #5 .) (dsg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (dsg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (dsg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #2 sent to Jason Paul Schaefer returned as undeliverable. (joha)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Plaintiff.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (NO IFP Filed, NO Filing Fee Paid) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer against All Defendants. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaefer v. Mutchler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Mutchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Schodowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourenn Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-10 Unknown Others
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?