Doe v. Reed College
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Reed College
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Evidentiary Hearing held on January 30, 2019, before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Jill L. Jessup, telephone number (503)326-8191 or email at jill_jessup@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter at (503)326-8191 or email at jill_jessup@ord.uscourts.gov or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 3/1/2019. Redaction Request due 3/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2019. (jjcr)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by John Doe. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTES OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Witness John Doe sworn and examined. Plaintiff's Exhibits 1 and 2 received by the Court. Order - Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #2 ) is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. Susan C. Stone and Jeffrey M. Edelson present as counsel for Plaintiff. Paula A. Barran present as counsel for Defendant. Court Reporter: Jill Jessup. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 Verified Amended Complaint Summons issued as to Reed College. Filed by John Doe against Reed College. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym and for Protective Order (ECF #5 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support #2 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Reed College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Barran, Paula)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF #2 ) is due no later than 10:00PM on 1/29/2019. Oral Argument is set for 1/30/2019 at 02:00PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance of Paula A. Barran appearing on behalf of Reed College Filed by on behalf of Reed College. (Barran, Paula)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kristina W. Supler (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: kwsupler. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristina W. Supler for John Doe. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5717075 issued. Signed on 1/29/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Susan C. Stone (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: scstone. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Susan C. Stone for John Doe. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5717059 issued. Signed on 1/29/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) Modified on 1/30/2019 to correct date document was signed.(ecp).
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristina W. Supler . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5717075. Filed by John Doe. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan C. Stone . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5717059. Filed by John Doe. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym, Motion for Protective Order . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Edelson, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Reed College. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/27/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order , Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Edelson, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5716815 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by John Doe against Reed College (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons). (Edelson, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/28/2019 to add payment information(ecp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Reed College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed College
Represented By: Paula A. Barran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Represented By: Susan C. Stone
Represented By: Kristina W. Supler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?