Hammick v. Jacobs et al
Plaintiff: Marit Hammick
Defendant: Franklin United, Inc. and Matthew Scott Jacobs
Case Number: 3:2019cv00200
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 4/1/19. Order Resetting the following deadlines: Discovery is to be completed by 8/12/2019. Written consents, if any, should be submitted by 8/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/9/2019. Dispositive Motions are due by 9/9/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/9/2019 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. Willard Merkel present as counsel for plaintiff(s). John Barhoum present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 4/1/2019 at 2:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Franklin United, Inc., Matthew Scott Jacobs. (Barhoum, John)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Barhoum, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Jessica Lancaster in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service) (Barhoum, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV02046 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5732329 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Franklin United, Inc., Matthew Scott Jacobs (Attachments: #1 Attachment Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammick v. Jacobs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin United, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Scott Jacobs
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jessica Lewicki Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marit Hammick
Represented By: Willard E. Merkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?