Dabney v. Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC et al

Plaintiff: Matt Dabney
Defendant: Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC, Shenzhen Aweite Technology Co., Ltd., Surefire Vapor, LLC and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2019cv00230
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order: Joint Status Report #8 is adopted. New case schedule is as follows: Fact Discovery is to be completed by 8/16/2019. Deadline to amend pleadings and join parties is 9/6/2019. Dispositive Motions, if any, are due by 10/7/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/1/2019. The parties will exchange expert disclosures and reports, no later than thirty days after the Court's ruling on dispositive motions. Any rebuttal disclosure and report(s) are due two weeks thereafter. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Notice of Case Assignment (ECF #2 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/consenting-to-magistrate-judge-jurisdiction. Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-9 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration; however, the rule otherwise remains in effect for any other judges handling matters in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Status Report of Rule 26(F) Conference & Discovery Plan. Filed by Matt Dabney. (Patton, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Tori S. Levine (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tslevine. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tori S. Levine for Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5778911 issued. Signed on 3/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tori S. Levine . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5778911. Filed by Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC. (Engel, Robert)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. . Filed by Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC. (Engel, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC. (Engel, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/14/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV02209 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5739203 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Engel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabney v. Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Vapor Co., LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Engel
Represented By: Tori S. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Aweite Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surefire Vapor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Dabney
Represented By: Thomas C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?