Radagast Pet Food, Inc. v. Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Radagast Pet Food, Inc.
Defendant: Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC and Frontenac Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00731
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Radagast Pet Food, Inc. against Frontenac Company LLC, Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time #8 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 7/8/2019 for all defendants. (gm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Frontenac Company LLC, Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC. (Weiss, Frank)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Complaint, #1 on Frontenac Company LLC served on 6/6/2019; Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC served on 6/6/2019 Filed by Radagast Pet Food, Inc.. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (eo)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper.. (ecp)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Radagast Pet Food, Inc.. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by Radagast Pet Food, Inc.. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. for Trademark Infringement and Breach of Contract Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5845644 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 4198367--8/28/2012--Radagast Pet Food, Inc.. Filed by Radagast Pet Food, Inc. against All Defendants. (Milesnick, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radagast Pet Food, Inc. v. Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitebridge Pet Brands, LLC
Represented By: Frank J. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontenac Company LLC
Represented By: Frank J. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radagast Pet Food, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?