Kerns et al v. Power Auto, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Kerns and Navarre Kerns
Defendant: KTM Sportmotorcycles GmbH, KTM AG, Power Auto, Inc., KTM North America, Inc. and Power Motorsports
Case Number: 3:2019cv00762
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING plaintiffs' unopposed motion #15 for leave to file an amended complaint. The First Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before 7/15/19. (peg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redlined Proposed First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) (O'Leary, Leslie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Tessan Wess appearing on behalf of Power Auto, Inc., Power Motorsports Filed by on behalf of Power Auto, Inc., Power Motorsports. (Wess, Tessan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon Power Auto, Inc. served on 5/31/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Power Motorsports served on 5/31/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on KTM North America, Inc. served on 5/31/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to KTM AG, KTM North America, Inc., KTM Sportmotorcycles GmbH, Power Auto, Inc., Power Motorsports. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie) (Main Document 9 replaced with corrected summons on 5/30/2019) (joha).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Corrie J. Yackulic for Lauren Kerns and Navarre Kerns. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5860317 issued. Signed on 5/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to KTM North America, Inc. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (O'Leary, Leslie)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Corrie J. Yackulic . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5860317. Filed by Lauren Kerns, Navarre Kerns. (O'Leary, Leslie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by KTM North America, Inc.. (Knottnerus, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by KTM North America, Inc.. (Knottnerus, John)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/15/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV21295 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5850067 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by KTM North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Knottnerus, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerns et al v. Power Auto, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Kerns
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Represented By: Corrie J. Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navarre Kerns
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Represented By: Corrie J. Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTM Sportmotorcycles GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTM AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Tessan Wess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTM North America, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Knottnerus
Represented By: Michael A. Yoshida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Motorsports
Represented By: Tessan Wess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?