Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund v. Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund
Defendant: Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00811
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 8/27/2019, at 10:00 AM by telephone. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate sealed entry) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. The parties are to use land-line telephones, as the Court prohibits the use of speaker phones, cell phones and headsets. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Jeremy E. Roller (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jeroller. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy E. Roller for Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5895583 issued. Signed on 6/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy E. Roller . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5895583. Filed by Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.. (Stanford, Darian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.. (Stanford, Darian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.. (Stanford, Darian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc. served on 5/29/2019 Filed by Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund. (Miller, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/25/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund. (Miller, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5864585 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund against Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Miller, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund v. Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welfare & Pension Administration Service, Inc.
Represented By: Darian A. Stanford
Represented By: Jeremy E. Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Western States Office and Professional Employees Pension Fund
Represented By: Robert B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?