Linton-Helms v. State of Oregon

Petitioner: Dena R. Linton-Helms
Respondent: State of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00877
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Susan F. Wilk is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Dena R. Linton-Helms. (Wilk, Susan)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. Petitioner shall file an Amended Petitioner naming her custodian as the Respondent. Petitioner's failure to do so within 60 days will result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/28/19.) (dsg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/7/2019.) (joha)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 83943 issued. Filed by Dena R. Linton-Helms against State of Oregon. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linton-Helms v. State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dena R. Linton-Helms
Represented By: Susan F. Wilk
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?