Meeks et al v. Hyundai Capital America Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Reyna and Ashlyn Meeks
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00949
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF No. #5 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 9/5/2019. Ordered on 8/5/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Hyundai Capital America Inc.. (Laurick, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Hyundai Capital America Inc.. (Laurick, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Hyundai Capital America Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due on 8/6/2019. (Fuller, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Hyundai Capital America Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/15/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sss)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5892937 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ashlyn Meeks, Amy Reyna against Hyundai Capital America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Fuller, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks et al v. Hyundai Capital America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America Inc.
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Reyna
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Represented By: Justin M. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlyn Meeks
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Represented By: Kelly D. Jones
Represented By: Justin M. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?