Lopez v. Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Defendant: Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc. and Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00950
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez: As this case is reported settled, the parties shall submit Final Papers on or before 9/7/2019. All pending motions are STRICKEN as moot. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Settlement Filed by Daniel Lopez. (Sellers, James)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #12 . Answer is due by 8/9/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Michael J. Farrell . Filed by Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #12 .) (Farrell, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Second]. Filed by Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . Answer is due by 7/26/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Michael J. Farrell in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #8 .) (Farrell, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Filed by Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Genesis FS Card Services, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due on 7/12/2019. (Sellers, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Daniel Lopez. (Sellers, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/15/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (ecp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Complaint . Filed by Daniel Lopez against Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.. (Sellers, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5893067 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Daniel Lopez against Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sellers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Financial Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis FS Card Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farrell
Represented By: Thomas W. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lopez
Represented By: James A. Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?