Vangsness
Petitioner: Brent Louis Vangsness
Case Number: 3:2019cv00963
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Change of Address and Request for Injunction. Filed by Brent Louis Vangsness. (joha)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Issuance of Order to Produce Documents and Tangible Things. Filed by Brent Louis Vangsness. (joha)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is DISMISSED. Pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 7/31/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/1/2019.) (joha)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO DISMISS: The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (#1 ) is summarily dismissed where venue is not proper in the District of Oregon. Plaintiff's pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction (#3 ) is denied as moot. The Court certifies that any appeal taken from this Order would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a) (3); Fed. R. App. P. 24 (a) ( 3) (A). Signed on 7/31/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/1/2019.) (joha)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/20/19.) (dsg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Brent Louis Vangsness. (dsg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Affidavit of Brent Louis Vangsness. Filed by Brent Louis Vangsness. (Related document(s): Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 .) (dsg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Brent Louis Vangsness. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vangsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brent Louis Vangsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?