Panschow v. SHU Guard Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Neal Allen Panschow
Defendant: SHU Guard Garcia, SHU Guard Mosillo and Medical NP Malingkas
Case Number: 3:2019cv00994
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Order to Transfer #3 to Neal Allen Panschow (USM #76758-065) to: FCI Mendota, P.O. Box 9, Mendota, CA 93640. (pvh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Neal Allen Panschow Regarding Order to Transfer #3 . (sb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order, #3 Sent to Neal Allen Panschow Returned as Undeliverable. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/12/19.) (sb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Neal Allen Panschow regarding Order to Transfer #3 . (joha)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Neal Allen Panschow. (joha)
July 17, 2019 Case electronically transferred out to the District of Central California. Other Court Case Number 5:19-cv-01296 assigned. (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO TRANSFER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the Eastern Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed on 7/12/19 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/12/19.) (dsg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (kms)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. (No Fee, No IFP) Filed by Neal Allen Panschow against Medical NP Malingkas, SHU Guard Garcia, SHU Guard Mosillo (Attachments: #1 Attachment). (kms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panschow v. SHU Guard Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHU Guard Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHU Guard Mosillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical NP Malingkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Allen Panschow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?