Poulson v. Bridge et al
Plaintiff: Kermit Ty Poulson
Defendant: FBI Agent Bridge, U.S. Government, Officer Bloomster, Dr. Platas and Officer Miller
Case Number: 3:2019cv01018
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Expansion of Record. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (dsg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Judgment #9 sent to Kermit Ty Poulson returned as undeliverable. (joha)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Based upon Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (#6 ), IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 7/10/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/10/2019.) (joha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Add Exhibits. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (joha) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/10/2019) (joha).
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Enter Exhibits Q-Z. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (joha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (sb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/27/2019.) (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Receive Probation Instead of Incarceration. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Admit Kites, and Grievances, Appeals as Articles of Evidence. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson against Bloomster, Bridge, Miller, Platas, U.S. Government. (dsg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulson v. Bridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI Agent Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bloomster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Platas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kermit Ty Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?