McGee v. Multnomah County Sherrifs Office et al

Plaintiff: Menphrey Douglas McGee
Defendant: Multnomah County Sherrifs Office, Heather DeLynne Wilson, State of Oregon D.H.S., C.A.R.E.S. Northwest and Portland Police Dept.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01031
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Menphrey Douglas McGee. Filed by Menphrey Douglas McGee. (joha)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Menphrey Douglas McGee. (dsg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice titled "Multiple and Numerous Violations to Equal Protection of Law." Filed by Menphrey Douglas McGee. (joha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DENIED. Plaintiff may file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. The amended application must bear the Civil No. 3:19-cv-01031-JR. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 7/9/19 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 7/9/2019.) (dsg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/11/2019) (cw).
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/1/2019.) (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Menphrey Douglas McGee against C.A.R.E.S. Northwest, Multnomah County Sherrifs Office, Portland Police Dept., State of Oregon D.H.S., Heather DeLynne Wilson. (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Menphrey Douglas McGee. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Multnomah County Sherrifs Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Menphrey Douglas McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multnomah County Sherrifs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather DeLynne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon D.H.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.A.R.E.S. Northwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?