Szanto
Appellant: Peter Szanto
Trustee: Stephen P. Arnot
Case Number: 3:2019cv01039
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeals Rule 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Appeal Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/16/19.) (eo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Record for Bankruptcy Appeal. (eo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 First Amended Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court. Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 16-bk-33185-pcm7. Filed by Peter Szanto. NOTE: The amended notice includes the orders being appealed as attachments. (eo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo) Copy mailed to appellant on 7/1/19.
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal and Optional Statement of Election to District Court. Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 16-33185-pcm. The Filling Fee was paid at the Bankruptcy Court. Receipt Number A17643969. Filed by Stephen P. Arnot. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peter Szanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Stephen P. Arnot
Represented By: Stephen P. Arnot
Represented By: Gary L. Blacklidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?