Brown v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., a foreign corporation
Plaintiff: Billy Brown
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01045
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 8/21/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Woods, Dennis)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Firm Name, Email and Website Address Change Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Woods, Dennis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Unavailability Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Woods, Dennis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Woods, Dennis)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 9/16/2019 at 2:00PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Woods, Dennis)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Woods, Dennis)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/30/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/29/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Dennis G. Woods In Support of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Notice of Removal. Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., a foreign corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Woods, Dennis)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV23945 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5912473 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., a foreign corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal from State Court, #4 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit Discovery Requests, #7 Civil Cover Sheet). (Woods, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., a foreign corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Brown
Represented By: Lowell P. McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Dennis G. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?