Williams-Meteyer v. Wilkie
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer and Fredda J.
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Case Number: 3:2019cv01076
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is denied. Signed on 8/31/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/5/2019.) (pvh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer. (rs)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (rs)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/19/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Mailed to Pro Se Party on 7/22/19 (sb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer Regarding Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #6 . (sb)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 . Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer regarding Case Assignment Notice #4 . (sb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (sb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer. (sb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer against Robert Wilkie (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment). (sb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer. (sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Meteyer v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Williams-Meteyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredda J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?