Weeder v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Tracie E. Weeder
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01078
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Case electronically transferred out to the District of California Northern. Other Court Case Number 3:19-cv-05378 assigned. (dsg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Pursuant to MDL 2741, Docket No. 1146. Certified on 8/2/2019 by Deputy Clerk William Noble of the Northern District of California. (jn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-144) finalized on 8/2/19. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/2/19. (jn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon Monsanto Company served on 7/15/2019 Filed by Tracie E. Weeder. (O'Leary, Leslie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Monsanto Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5922044 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Tracie E. Weeder against Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Monsanto Company). (O'Leary, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weeder v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie E. Weeder
Represented By: Leslie W. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?