Johnson v. Peters et al

Plaintiff: David C. Johnson
Defendant: Dr. Paulson, Dr. C. Digiulio, Collette Peters, Dr. Kelly, Mr. Causey, Dr. Yao, T. Bailey, Dr. Karen Harris, Carry Coffey, S. Johnson and B. Carter
Case Number: 3:2019cv01082
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #8 . Waiver of Service is due by 10/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 09/04/2019.) (rsm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Andrew Hallman In Support of Motion to Extend Time to File Waiver. Filed by Collette Peters. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #8 .) (Hallman, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to file Waiver. Filed by Collette Peters. (Hallman, Andrew)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 9/5/2019.(Copy mailed to Plaintiff, Copy emailed to Andrew Hallman w/supporting documents).(Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/7/2019.) (jkm)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and to Collect Filing Fee: Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel with leave to renew at a later stage of the proceedings #3 . ; Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 .ORDERED: The Oregon Department of Corrections shall collect from plaintiffs prison trust account the $350.00 filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of the Court. (Copy of this Order to Plaintiff, Andrew Hallman, Oregon Department of Corrections). Signed on 8/6/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/7/2019.) (jkm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/12/2019.) (joha)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by David C. Johnson. (joha)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by David C. Johnson against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (joha)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by David C. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. C. Digiulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collette Peters
Represented By: Andrew D. Hallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Yao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Karen Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carry Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?