Western Resources Legal Center v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
Plaintiff: Western Resources Legal Center
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv01119
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, November, 12, 2019 at 10:00AM. The Court's conference line call-in information will be sent to counsel by separate entry. (peg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Rice-Stitt, Austin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Navtej S. Dhillon (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: nsdhillon. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Navtej S. Dhillon for Western Resources Legal Center. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5931584 issued. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Christopher J. Carr (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cjcarr. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Carr for Western Resources Legal Center. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5931568 issued. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) Modified on 7/25/2019 to correct date of signature(ecp).
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (sss)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/19/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Navtej Singh Dhillon . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931584. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Lobdell, Caroline)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher J. Carr . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931568. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Lobdell, Caroline)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western Resources Legal Center. (Lobdell, Caroline)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931465 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Western Resources Legal Center against National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Lobdell, Caroline) Modified docket text on 7/19/2019 to update defendants. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Resources Legal Center v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Resources Legal Center
Represented By: Caroline Lobdell
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Represented By: Navtej S. Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Austin Rice-Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Austin Rice-Stitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?