Alcorn v. Alpha Media LLC
Plaintiff: Victor Alcorn
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01193
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #10 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/22/2019. The deadlines set forth in the Court's Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF No. #2 ) are extended by 60 days. Pretrial Order deadline is stricken. Ordered on 8/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Alpha Media LLC. Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Extension of Deadlines in Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order Complaint, #1 . Filed by Alpha Media LLC. (Marmaduke, Susan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Alpha Media LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due on 8/23/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Richard Liebowitz (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rliebowitz. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Liebowitz for Victor Alcorn. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5951372 issued. Signed on 8/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The document was blank or missing pages. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5951372. Filed by Victor Alcorn. (Stevens, Michael) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/6/2019) (cw).
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (joha) (Mailed to Register of Copyrights on 8/2/2019.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alpha Media LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/2/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/30/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/30/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5947552 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Victor Alcorn against Alpha Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Copyright Report). (Stevens, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcorn v. Alpha Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alcorn
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Represented By: Susan D. Marmaduke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?