United States v. Cannery Pier Hotel LLC et al
Plaintiff: Senior Counsel sean carman and United States of America
Defendant: Terry Rosenau and Cannery Pier Hotel LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01217
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Satisfaction of Judgment by United States of America. Filed by United States of America. (Carman, Sean)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERING CONSENT DECREE. Signed on 9/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion to Approve Consent Judgment . Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Carman, Sean)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lodging of Consent Decree Filed by United States of America. (Carman, Sean) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct docket text (jn).
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Lodged Settlement Agreement and Consent Decree. Filed by United States of America. (Carman, Sean) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct docket text (jn).
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Lodged Complaint. Civil Complaint for Recovery of Costs under the Oil Pollution Act (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Carman, Sean) Modified on 8/8/2019 to correct docket text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Cannery Pier Hotel LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Rosenau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannery Pier Hotel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senior Counsel sean carman
Represented By: Sean K. Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sean K. Carman
Represented By: Alexis Lien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?