Young v. U.S. Attorney General
Petitioner: Timothy Doyle Young
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv01227
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo) Copy mailed to petitioner.
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-04435. Electronic file received.
August 6, 2019 The United States District Court for the District of Oregon shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re #3 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/7/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This action is TRANSFERRED to the District of Oregon. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/7/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/9/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/7/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING);. Filed byTimothy Doyle Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Doyle Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?