Hanson v. Wang et al
Plaintiff: Michael L. Hanson
Defendant: Dian Phan and Brandon Hong Wang
Case Number: 3:2019cv01232
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Dian Phan served on 8/14/2019, answer due on 9/4/2019; Brandon Hong Wang served on 8/14/2019, answer due on 9/4/2019. (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Complaint. Filed by Michael L. Hanson against Dian Phan, Brandon Hong Wang (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (dsg)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to pro se on 8/8/2019.) (dsg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Michael L. Hanson against Dian Phan, Brandon Hong Wang (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (dsg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Michael L. Hanson. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Wang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dian Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hong Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?