Benedict et al v. Unity in Lynnwood et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Scott Benedict and C. B.
Defendant: Unity in Lynnwood, Richard Loren Held and Matthew Wilson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01295
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Plaintiff regarding Order on motion for extension of time to answer a Complaint/Petition 9 . (jp)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . Answer is due by 11/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Barhoum, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of John R. Barhoum appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Barhoum, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kevin S. Benedict regarding Discovery order, #5 . (rs)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/18/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kevin Scott Benedict Guardian of C.B. in pro per regarding Case Assignment Notice #2 . (rs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (rs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. 85172. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kevin Scott Benedict against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedict et al v. Unity in Lynnwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Scott Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unity in Lynnwood
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Loren Held
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wilson
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?