Orias v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lee E Orias
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01302
Filed: August 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Referring Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (16) in case 3:19-cv-01287-HZ and in case 3:19-cv-01302-HZ. Answer is due by 11/5/2019. No further extensions of time will be granted absent good cause shown. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-01287-HZ, 3:19-cv-01302-HZ (jp)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, (1 in 3:19-cv-01302-HZ), Complaint, (1 in 3:19-cv-01287-HZ). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-01287-HZ, 3:19-cv-01302-HZ (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendant Wells Fargo's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate #13 is GRANTED. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 42 and LR 42, Orias v. Equifax, 3:19-cv-01302-AC is consolidated with Orias v. Equifax, 3:19-cv-01287-HZ for all purposes, including trial. All future filings shall be filed only in Orias v. Equifax, 3:19-cv-01287-HZ, with that case indicated as the lead case and Orias v. Equifax, 3:19-cv-01302-AC, indicated as the trailing case, as required by LR 42-4. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-01287-HZ, 3:19-cv-01302-HZ (jp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Defendant Wells Fargo's Unopposed Motion #13 to Consolidate this matter with 3:19-cv-1287-HZ, Julie Ann Orias v. Equifax Information Services, LLC, et al. This matter will be reassigned to Judge Hernandez for all further proceedings. Counsel are to follow the guidelines in L.R. 42.3(1) "When a party seeks or opposes consolidation, the motion or opposition must be filed in each case to be consolidated. Each motion or opposition must include: The case number, case title, and assigned judge of every related case pending in the District of Oregon." as well as further directions contained in this local rule. NOTE: Plaintiff's counsel does not appear to have local counsel as required, nor has he filed a Motion for Leave to Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiff's counsel is to take care of this immediately. Once the two cases are granted consolidation. ALL filing is to only be in the case designated as the LEAD CASE, i.e. the lowest numbered case that was filed first. (peg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Samuel Hernandez . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion to Consolidate #13 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendant Wells Fargo's unopposed motion #9 to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint up to and including 10/15/19. (peg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Samuel Hernandez appearing on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Filed by on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 8/27/2019, answer due on 9/17/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due on 9/17/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/17/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/16/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
August 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Filed by Lee E Orias. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5966653 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Lee E Orias against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orias v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Samuel Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee E Orias
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?