D.E. v. United Airlines
Plaintiff: D.E.
Defendant: United Airlines and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2019cv01318
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Thursday, 11/14/2019 at 09:30AM (by telephone) before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by United Airlines. (Rosen, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by United Airlines. (Rosen, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sss)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Airlines. (sss)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5969827 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by D.E. against All Parties. (Lawrence, Efrem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.E. v. United Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.E.
Represented By: Efrem B. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines
Represented By: Steven O. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?