Freeman v. Silver
Plaintiff: Sheik S Freeman
Defendant: Adam Jerome Silver
Case Number: 3:2019cv01326
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: It is Ordered and Adjudged that this action is Dismissed with prejudice. Any appeal of this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3); Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Signed on 10/18/19 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/18/19.) (gm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Adopting the Magistrate's Findings and Recommendation #7 . Plaintiff's amended complaint #6 is Dismissed and this action is Dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 10/18/19 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/18/19.) (gm)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Findings & Recommendation #7 is referred to Judge Marco A. Hernandez for review. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of a copy of this recommendation within which to file specific written objections with the court. Thereafter, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days within which to file a response to the objections. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/19.) (gm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiff's amended complaint #6 should be dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 9/9/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/19.) (gm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Complaint. Filed by Sheik S Freeman against Adam Jerome Silver. (rs)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application/Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 is Granted. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is Dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is allowed 30 days from the date of this order to file a complaint that complies with the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a). Failure to file an amended complaint as ordered will result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed on 8/27/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/27/19.) (gm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Sheik S Freeman regarding Case Assignment Notice #2 . (rs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Sheik S Freeman. (rs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (rs)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sheik S Freeman against Adam Jerome Silver (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (rs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Jerome Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheik S Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?