Curry v. State of Oregon
Petitioner: Anthony Lenaire Curry
Respondent: State of Oregon
Case Number: 3:2019cv01346
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #11 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 19-35878 assigned. (jtj)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Order #9 and Judgment, #10 . Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry. (dsg)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is dismissed. The Court DENIES a certificate of appealability as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Signed on 9/19/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/19/2019.) (joha)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court summarily DISMISSES the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. #2 ). The Court DENIES petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) on the basis that the interests of justice do not warrant appointment. The Court FINDS MOOT petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Petition (ECF No. #4 ); Motion to Re-Assign Case to Judge Simon (ECF No. #6 ), and Motion for Stay (ECF No. #7 ). Signed on 9/19/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/19/2019.) (joha)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Petitioner moves to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ). An examination of the application reveals that petitioner is unable to afford the costs of this action. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The petition may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 9/19/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/19/2019.) (joha)
September 16, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 85543 issued. (re)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Stay. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry. (dsg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Reassign Case to Judge Simon. Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry. (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/26/2019.) (dsg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to file Memorandum in Support of Petition. Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Memorandum) (dsg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry. (dsg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry against State of Oregon. (dsg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Anthony Lenaire Curry. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Lenaire Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?